Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Manuel Moiteiro Ramos

Bishop of Aveiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1956 BornAldeia de João Pires
4 Jul 198125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Guarda, Portugal
8 Jun 201256.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
8 Jun 201256.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
12 Aug 201256.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
4 Jul 201458.1AppointedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Manuel Moiteiro Ramos:
Bishop António Manuel Moiteiro Ramos (born ) Bishop of Aveiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aveiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,526
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Jul 2014