Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel da Rocha Felício

Bishop of Guarda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1947 BornMamouros
21 Oct 197326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Viseu, Portugal
21 Oct 200255.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
21 Oct 200255.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
15 Dec 200255.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
21 Dec 200457.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Guarda, Portugal
1 Dec 200558.1SucceededBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel da Rocha Felício:
Bishop Manuel da Rocha Felício (born ) Bishop of Guarda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guarda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Jul 2014