Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel da Silva Rodrigues Linda

Bishop of Porto, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1956 Born
10 Jun 198125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Vila Real, Portugal
27 Jun 200953.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
27 Jun 200953.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
20 Sep 200953.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
10 Oct 201357.4AppointedBishop of Portugal, Military
15 Mar 201861.9AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
15 Apr 201862.0InstalledBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel da Silva Rodrigues Linda
Bishop Manuel da Silva Rodrigues Linda (born ) Bishop of Porto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaus
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora da Conceição, Church, Vila Real, Diocese of Vila Real

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Porto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2009
  • ob/c1+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,279
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2018
  • i: CB, 20 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast