Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Alves

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coimbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1925BornTorres Novas
29 Jun 195125.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 197549.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal
5 Sep 197549.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Scala
23 Nov 197549.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scala
8 Sep 197650.7AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
24 Mar 200175.3RetiredBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
28 Jun 201387.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João Alves:
Bishop João Alves (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coimbra

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 28 Jun 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 13 Mar 2014