Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Pedro Barbosa da Silva Nunes

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Titular Bishop of Elvas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1942BornLisboa
4 Nov 197330.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
7 Mar 199855.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
7 Mar 199855.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Elvas
17 May 199855.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elvas
1 Sep 201067.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Tomás Pedro Barbosa da Silva Nunes:
Bishop Tomás Pedro Barbosa da Silva Nunes (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,325
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013