Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António José da Rocha Couto, S.M.P.

Bishop of Lamego, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1952 Born
3 Dec 198028.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionários da Boa Nova
6 Jul 200755.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
6 Jul 200755.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Azura
23 Sep 200755.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azura
19 Nov 201159.5AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
29 Jan 201259.7InstalledBishop of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António José da Rocha Couto
Bishop António José da Rocha Couto S.M.P. (born ) Bishop of Lamego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVila Boa do Bispo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lamego.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2007
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,519
  • i: CB, 19 Nov 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast