Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Gonçalo Alves de Souza

Auxiliary Bishop of Porto

Titular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1945 BornLanheses
15 Aug 196823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
18 Feb 201165.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
18 Feb 201165.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
10 Apr 201166.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
1 Jul 201368.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Pio Gonçalo Alves de Souza:
Bishop Pio Gonçalo Alves de Souza (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Porto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Porto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,034
  • ab: CB, 1 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013