Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Alves de Matos

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Pessinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1855Born
22 Sep 188328.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 190348.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
25 Jun 190348.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
8 Nov 190348.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
9 Dec 191560.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pessinus
14 Apr 191762.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Alves de Matos
Archbishop José Alves de Matos (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSouto da Carpalhosa

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 388
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018