Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Ferreira da Silva

Deceased

Prelate of Mozambico

Titular Bishop of Syene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1852BornAguiar da Beira
14 Nov 190452.8AppointedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique
14 Nov 190452.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Syene
29 Jun 190553.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Syene
8 May 192068.3DiedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ferreira da Silva:
Bishop Francisco Ferreira da Silva (born , died ) Prelate of Mozambico

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,112
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013