Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Moutinho

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1862BornGranja
2 Aug 188522.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Porto, Portugal
19 Sep 188522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
21 Aug 190138.7AppointedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique
21 Aug 190138.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
6 Jan 190239.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Argos
14 Nov 190441.9AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
29 Apr 190946.4AppointedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
18 May 191552.4DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Moutinho:
Bishop António Moutinho (born , died ) Bishop of Portalegre

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,795
  • c3+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,110
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 121
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013