Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Damasceno da Costa

Deceased

Bishop of Angra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1867Born
20 Sep 189023.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 191447.6AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
11 Apr 191548.1Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
27 Jan 192254.9DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Damasceno da Costa
Bishop Manuel Damasceno da Costa (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCovilha

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 56
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018