Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alves Martins

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Titular Bishop of Bela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1874BornVergão, Portugal
18 Jul 189723.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 191036.0AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
3 Jul 191036.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
15 Nov 193561.6ResignedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
15 Nov 193561.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bela
14 Apr 195076.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for José Alves Martins:
Bishop José Alves Martins (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013