Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastião José Pereira

Deceased

Bishop of Damão, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1857Born
30 Jun 188022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Portalegre, Portugal
16 Nov 189740.1AppointedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique
16 Nov 189740.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
9 Jan 189840.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
23 Jul 190042.8AppointedBishop of Damão, India
4 Aug 192567.8DiedBishop of Damão, India

MicroData Summary for Sebastião José Pereira
Bishop Sebastião José Pereira (born , died ) Bishop of Damão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasaes Cinreiros, Diocese of Portalegre, Portugal
Ordained BishopCernache do Bonjardim, Seminary, Portalegre, Diocese of Portalegre, Portugal

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,107
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 238, and Page 261
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017