Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastião da Anunciação Gomes de Lemos, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1786BornEixo, Portugal
8 Jul 181024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
31 Dec 184559.4SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
16 Apr 184659.7ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
1848²61.4ResignedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
6 Jun 186881.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo, Angola

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastião da Anunciação Gomes de Lemos:
Bishop Sebastião da Anunciação Gomes de Lemos O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo

  • a priest for 57.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • r/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014