Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Santa Rita Barros, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angola e Congo, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1810Born
1828¹17.3ProfessedMember of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
2 Mar 183322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
14 May 185948.7SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
23 Mar 186049.5ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
26 Aug 186049.9Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
3 Jan 186251.3DiedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Santa Rita Barros
Bishop Manuel de Santa Rita Barros T.O.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Angola e Congo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopSeminary, Santarém, Diocese of Santarém, Para, Brazil

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 103
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017