Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Moreira Reis, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1812Born
20 Dec 184533.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Jun 184937.0SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
28 Sep 184937.4ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
1850¹37.6Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
10 Mar 185744.8ResignedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
1887¹74.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo, Angola

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Moreira Reis
Bishop Joaquim Moreira Reis O.S.B. (born , died 1887) Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paio de Guimara

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 103
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017