Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Crisóstomo de Amorim Pessoa, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Braga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1810BornCantanhede, Portugal
1827¹16.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
19 Sep 183524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Jul 185948.7SelectedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
23 Mar 186049.4ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
26 Aug 186049.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
9 Feb 186150.3SelectedArchbishop of Goa, India
22 Mar 186150.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Goa, India
17 Nov 187464.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Braga, Portugal
27 Nov 187666.1SucceededArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
Apr 1883²72.5ResignedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
22 Dec 188878.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Crisóstomo de Amorim Pessoa:
Archbishop João Crisóstomo de Amorim Pessoa O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Braga

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 156, and Page 287
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013