Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomé Ferreira da Silva

Bishop of São José do Rio Preto, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1961 BornCristina
1 Jan 198725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
9 Mar 200543.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
9 Mar 200543.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Giufi
13 May 200544.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giufi
26 Sep 201251.4AppointedBishop of São José do Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Nov 201251.5InstalledBishop of São José do Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tomé Ferreira da Silva:
Bishop Tomé Ferreira da Silva (born ) Bishop of São José do Rio Preto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São José do Rio Preto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,886
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2012
  • i: CB, 27 Sep 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013