Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloísio Ariovaldo (Tarcísio) Amaral, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1919Born
2 Feb 193818.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Aug 194323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
7 Nov 196747.8AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
17 Sep 197353.7CeasedSuperior General of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
29 Apr 197656.3AppointedBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Jun 197656.5Ordained BishopBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
14 Apr 198464.3AppointedBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
15 May 199171.3ResignedBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
2 Nov 199474.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aloísio Ariovaldo (Tarcísio) Amaral
Bishop Aloísio Ariovaldo (Tarcísio) Amaral C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Campanha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTabatinga
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora das Dores, Limeira, Diocese of Limeira, Sao Paulo

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 37, Number 2,242
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Aug 2021

Quantcast