Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Crippa, I.M.C.

Auxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia

Titular Bishop of Accia

Apostolic Administrator of Estância, Sergipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1958 BornBesana Brianza, Italy
13 Sep 198122.9ProfessedMember of Consolata Missionaries
14 Sep 198526.9Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
21 Mar 201253.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
21 Mar 201253.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Accia
13 May 201253.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Accia
25 Sep 201355.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Estância, Sergipe, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Crippa:
Bishop Giovanni Crippa I.M.C. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Mar 2012
  • c34: CB, 3 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,434
  • ab: CB, 25 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 25 Sep 2013