Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walmir Alberto Valle, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Joašaba, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1938Born
21 Dec 196325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
5 Nov 198547.5AppointedBishop of CÔndido Mendes, Brazil
6 Jan 198647.7Ordained BishopBishop of CÔndido Mendes, Brazil
2 Jun 198648.1InstalledBishop of CÔndido Mendes, Brazil
6 Nov 200264.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Joašaba, Santa Catarina, Brazil
9 Apr 200364.9SucceededBishop of Joašaba, Santa Catarina, Brazil
14 Apr 201072.0ResignedBishop of Joašaba, Santa Catarina, Brazil
26 Aug 201981.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Joašaba, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Walmir Alberto Valle
Bishop Walmir Alberto Valle I.M.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Joašaba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNova Trento
Death PlaceUniversitario Santa Terezinha, Hospital, Joašaba, Diocese of Joašaba, Santa Catarina
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Santa Terezinha, Cathedral, Joašaba, Diocese of Joašaba, Santa Catarina

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2010
  • d: CB, 26 Aug 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast