Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Ellena

Bishop Emeritus of Zé-Doca, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1938 BornValperga, Italy
29 Jun 196224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
18 Feb 200465.9AppointedBishop of Zé-Doca, Maranho, Brazil
12 Jun 200466.2Ordained BishopBishop of Zé-Doca, Maranho, Brazil
23 Jul 201476.3RetiredBishop of Zé-Doca, Maranho, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carlo Ellena:
Bishop Carlo Ellena (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Zé-Doca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zé-Doca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,611
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Jul 2014