Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Affonso Felippe Gregory

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Imperatriz, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1930BornEstrela
25 Feb 195626.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Aug 197949.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
2 Aug 197949.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
12 Oct 197949.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
16 Jul 198757.4AppointedBishop of Imperatriz, Maranho, Brazil
3 Aug 200575.5RetiredBishop of Imperatriz, Maranho, Brazil
6 Aug 200878.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Imperatriz, Maranho, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Affonso Felippe Gregory:
Bishop Affonso Felippe Gregory (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Imperatriz

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Aug 2005
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Jul 2014