Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adriano Mandarino Hypólito, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1918BornAracajú
18 Oct 194224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Nov 196244.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
22 Nov 196244.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Diospolis in Thracia
17 Feb 196345.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diospolis in Thracia
29 Aug 196648.6AppointedBishop of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
9 Nov 199476.8RetiredBishop of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
10 Aug 199678.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adriano Mandarino Hypólito:
Bishop Adriano Mandarino Hypólito O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nova Iguaçu

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 13 Jun 2014