Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Epaminondas José de Araújo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1922Born
12 Aug 194523.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 195937.7AppointedBishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil
27 Mar 196038.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil
27 Oct 196644.6AppointedBishop of Anápolis, Goias, Brazil
5 Jun 197856.2AppointedBishop of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil
28 Nov 198462.6ResignedBishop of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil
9 Jun 201088.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Epaminondas José de Araújo
Bishop Epaminondas José de Araújo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palmeira dos Índios

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaiçara
Ordained BishopJoão Pessoa, Paraíba

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 50.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 25
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 577

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 1 Oct 2020

Quantcast