Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Tobias de Freitas

Bishop Emeritus of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1935 Born
10 Jan 196529.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 198145.7AppointedBishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Brazil
14 Jun 198146.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Brazil
7 Nov 198651.3AppointedBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
26 Jul 200671.1ResignedBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jorge Tobias de Freitas
Bishop Jorge Tobias de Freitas (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nazaré

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalmeira dos Índios, Diocese of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas
Ordained BishopPalmeira dos Índios, Diocese of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nazaré.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast