Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel dos Reis de Farias

Bishop Emeritus of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1946 Born
6 Jan 198336.7Ordained PriestPriest of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
8 Aug 200155.2AppointedBishop of Patos, Paraiba, Brazil
10 Nov 200155.5Ordained BishopBishop of Patos, Paraiba, Brazil
1 Dec 200155.6InstalledBishop of Patos, Paraiba, Brazil
27 Jul 201165.2AppointedBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil
12 Jul 201771.2ResignedBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manoel dos Reis de Farias
Bishop Manoel dos Reis de Farias (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Petrolina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrobó

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Petrolina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,074
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jul 2017