Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Jackson Nóbrega de Sousa

Bishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1969 BornSão José de Espinharas
17 Dec 199324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Patos, Paraiba, Brazil
20 May 201546.0AppointedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
18 Jul 201546.2Ordained BishopBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
23 Aug 201546.3InstalledBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Jackson Nóbrega de Sousa:
Bishop Paulo Jackson Nóbrega de Sousa (born ) Bishop of Garanhuns

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Garanhuns.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 May 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 20 May 2015
  • c34/i: CB, 16 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,548

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015