Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa)

Dioecesis Ruibarbosensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • André de Witte, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 14 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Feira de Santana
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Baia
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 25,169 (9,721 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste 3
  • Mailing Address: Rua Antonio Novais s/n, C.P. 2345, 46800-000 Rua Barbosa, BA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (075)3252-1001
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
14 November 1959ErectedDiocese of Barra (do Rio Grande)
Diocese of Bonfim
Diocese of Caetité
Archdiocese of Săo Salvador da Bahia
Diocese of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa) (erected)
28 April 1979Territory LostDiocese of Barra (do Rio Grande)
Diocese of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa)
Diocese of Irecę (erected)
16 January 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa) (from Sao Salvador da Bahia)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966400,000450,00088.9%1292119,047131415ap1967
1970472,000480,00098.3%16143015,733211013ap1971
1976525,300534,50098.3%21113216,415171816ap1977
1980633,000646,00098.0%13112426,375161618ap1981
1990422,000468,00090.2%8122021,100162316ap1991
1999350,200412,00085.0%12112315,2263172916ap2000
2000367,000432,15984.9%11122315,9562183516ap2001
2001358,000421,84084.9%11112216,2721174316ap2002
2002361,000426,00084.7%11122315,6951194316ap2003
2003358,000421,84084.9%13132613,7691204616ap2004
2004358,000421,84084.9%14112514,3201164816ap2005
2010357,000445,00080.2%15112613,7301224823ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011