Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias William Schmidt, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1931Born
11 Jul 195221.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
30 May 195726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Jun 197241.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
10 Jun 197241.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mutugenna
10 Sep 197241.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mutugenna
14 May 197645.0AppointedBishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil
24 May 199261.0DiedBishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mathias William Schmidt
Bishop Mathias William Schmidt O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNortonville, KS, Diocese of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
Ordained BishopSt. Benedict, Abbey, Atchison, KS, Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas, USA

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • prof: CB, 3 May 2019
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1972, Number 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 4 May 2019

Quantcast