Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Joseph Hunkeler

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kansas City in Kansas, USA

Titular Archbishop of Selsea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1894Born
14 Jun 191925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
10 Mar 194551.1AppointedBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
1 May 194551.3Ordained BishopBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
28 Mar 195157.2AppointedBishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
9 Aug 195258.6AppointedArchbishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
4 Sep 196975.6RetiredArchbishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
4 Sep 196975.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selsea
1 Oct 197076.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kansas City in Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Joseph Hunkeler
Archbishop Edward Joseph Hunkeler (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kansas City in Kansas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedicine Lodge, KS

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1945, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast