Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Hugh Ryan

Deceased

Archbishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA

Note/Previous Titular See: (Rector/Catholic University of America)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1886Born
5 Jun 190922.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 193346.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Modra
25 Oct 193346.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Modra
3 Aug 193548.6AppointedBishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
28 Jul 194558.6AppointedArchbishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
23 Nov 194760.9DiedArchbishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for James Hugh Ryan
Archbishop James Hugh Ryan (born , died ) Archbishop of Omaha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIndianapolis

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017