Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Omaha

Archidioecesis Omahensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • George Joseph Lucas, Archbishop
  • Elden Francis Curtiss, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 4 August 1945
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Nebraska
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 36,378 (14,051 Square Miles)
  • Description: Boyd, Holt, Merrick, Nance, Boone, Antelope, Knox, Pierce, Madison, Platte, Colfax, Stanton, Wayne, Cedar, Dixon, Dakota, Thurston, Cuming, Dodge, Burt, Washington, Douglas, and Sarpy Counties.
  • Conference Region: IX (IA, KS, MO, NE)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: OM
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archomaha.com/
  • Mailing Address: 100 North 62nd St., Omaha, NE 68132-2795
  • Telephone: (402)558-3100
  • Fax: 558-3026

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Nebraska
6 January 1857ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Indian Territory East of the Rocky Mountains Vicariate Apostolic of Nebraska (erected)
5 March 1883Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Idaho and Montana
Vicariate Apostolic of Nebraska
Vicariate Apostolic of Montana (erected)
Diocese of Omaha
2 October 1885ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Nebraska Diocese of Omaha (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
2 August 1887Territory LostDiocese of Omaha Diocese of Cheyenne (erected)
2 August 1887Territory LostDiocese of Omaha Diocese of Lincoln (erected)
8 March 1912Territory LostDiocese of Omaha Diocese of Kearney (erected)
13 May 1916Territory LostDiocese of Omaha (Arthur, Wheeler, Greeley, and Howard Counties) Diocese of Kearney
Archdiocese of Omaha
4 August 1945ElevatedDiocese of Omaha Archdiocese of Omaha

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Omaha
1950125,842543,85623.1%205109314400114991162ap1951
1966184,929630,89029.3%2261693954682231,295144ap1967
1970192,415630,89030.5%2311694004812181,199140ap1971
1976198,372713,28427.8%235153388511282051,034155ap1977
1980216,779758,12528.6%21018039055563227844154ap1981
1990201,638781,70025.8%209151360560119204530159ap1991
1999214,574822,89226.1%22912034961414322340139ap2000
2000220,179827,60826.6%217121338651157147373157ap2001
2001214,046830,52225.8%223115338633142139306154ap2002
2002219,897853,30025.8%23199330666155122361138ap2003
2003222,938853,30026.1%23396329677163118361138ap2004
2004239,112867,53127.6%221100321744176123337138ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 21 Mar 2013