Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Boise City

Dioecesis Xylopolitana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Idaho and Montana
3 March 1868ErectedArchdiocese of Oregon City Vicariate Apostolic of Idaho and Montana (erected)
5 March 1883Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Idaho and Montana
Vicariate Apostolic of Nebraska
Vicariate Apostolic of Montana (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Idaho
5 March 1883Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Idaho and Montana Vicariate Apostolic of Idaho
Diocese of Boise City
25 August 1893ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Idaho (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese) Diocese of Boise City (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Boise City
195027,701524,8735.3%6117783551738850ap1951
195940,216669,8856.0%6517824908341104ap1960
196647,791700,0006.8%86181044591332859ap1967
197052,182741,0007.0%8017975372028565ap1971
197664,499820,0007.9%80251056143120066ap1977
198070,416915,9607.7%8420104677122814367ap1981
199070,9421,012,0007.0%8522107663292812371ap1991
1999122,6401,250,0009.8%90151051,16834610358ap2000
2000126,6501,258,70010.1%8113941,34731189957ap2001
2001130,5001,310,00010.0%7813911,43434179457ap2002
2002130,7501,340,0009.8%7912911,43651179957ap2003
2003133,9501,342,10010.0%7814921,45551219655ap2004
2004145,9001,351,00010.8%7613891,63949209551ap2005
2006148,1001,417,80010.4%7614901,64569209151ap2007
2012172,4341,567,58211.0%7815931,85470207552ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 5 Nov 2014