Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Joseph Kelly

Deceased

Bishop of Boise City, Idaho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1890BornThe Dalles, OR
2 Jun 191727.3Ordained PriestPriest of Boise City, Idaho, USA
19 Dec 192737.8AppointedBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
6 Mar 192838.0Ordained BishopBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
21 Apr 195666.2DiedBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Joseph Kelly:
Bishop Edward Joseph Kelly (born , died ) Bishop of Boise City

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013