Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Joseph Condon

Deceased

Bishop of Great Falls, Montana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1895BornColton, WA
14 Oct 191722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Spokane, Washington, USA
5 Aug 193944.3AppointedBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
18 Oct 193944.5Ordained BishopBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
26 Oct 193944.6InstalledBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
17 Aug 196772.4DiedBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Condon:
Bishop William Joseph Condon (born , died ) Bishop of Great Falls

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013