Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon

Archidioecesis Portlandensis in Oregon



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alexander King Sample, Archbishop
  • Peter Leslie Smith, Auxiliary Bishop
  • John George Vlazny, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Kenneth Donald Steiner, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Oregon Territory
1 December 1843ErectedDiocese of Saint Louis Vicariate Apostolic of Oregon Territory (erected)
24 July 1846Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Oregon Territory Diocese of Walla Walla (erected)
24 July 1846Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Oregon Territory Diocese of Vancouver Island (erected)
Diocese of Oregon City
24 July 1846ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Oregon Territory Diocese of Oregon City (erected) (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
Archdiocese of Oregon City
29 July 1850ElevatedDiocese of Oregon City Archdiocese of Oregon City
3 March 1868Territory LostArchdiocese of Oregon City Vicariate Apostolic of Idaho and Montana (erected)
19 June 1903Territory LostArchdiocese of Oregon City Diocese of Baker City (erected)
Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon
26 September 1928Name ChangedArchdiocese of Oregon City Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon
195092,378900,85210.3%125156281328160776140ap1951
1966197,8561,685,80011.7%1852904754163001,240112ap1967
19702,081,640.0%1999028901651,000120ap1971
1976275,2572,140,51212.9%2042374416241324661125ap1977
1980294,9522,195,80013.4%1822454276901384869126ap1981
1990251,2702,408,90010.4%1552293846546327687125ap1991
1999289,9512,799,20010.4%1471793268892976539125ap2000
2000294,2212,841,90010.4%16518234784730293542124ap2001
2001297,8412,869,75010.4%16417834287030277531123ap2002
2002351,1642,969,84711.8%1651813461,01430282529125ap2003
2003356,0373,010,80011.8%1621783401,04739282506124ap2004
2004389,3453,038,60012.8%1661703361,15839293487124ap2005
2010415,0003,269,19512.7%1581493071,35167254400124ap2011
2012415,7253,327,11012.5%1591443031,37279245388124ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Sep 2014