Catholic-Hierarchy DC

William Joseph Cardinal Levada

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1936 BornLong Beach
20 Dec 196125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
25 Mar 198346.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
25 Mar 198346.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Capreae
12 May 198346.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capreae
1 Jul 198650.0AppointedArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
17 Aug 199559.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
27 Dec 199559.5SucceededArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
22 Jul 199963.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santa Rosa in California, USA
11 Apr 200063.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Santa Rosa in California, USA
13 May 200568.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
13 May 200568.9AppointedPresident of the International Theological Commission
13 May 200568.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Biblical Commission
24 Mar 200669.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200669.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
26 Mar 200669.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
8 Jul 200973.1AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
2 Jul 201276.0RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
2 Jul 201276.0RetiredPresident of the International Theological Commission
2 Jul 201276.0RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Biblical Commission
2 Jul 201276.0RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Levada:
William Joseph Cardinal Levada (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Doctrine of the Faith

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 7 Oct 2014