Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marek Solczyński

Apostolic Nuncio to Tanzania

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1961 Born
28 May 198726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
26 Nov 201150.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Georgia
26 Nov 201150.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
15 Dec 201150.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Armenia
6 Jan 201250.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
14 Apr 201251.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Azerbaijan
25 Apr 201756.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Marek Solczyński
Archbishop Marek Solczyński (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Tanzania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStawiszyn, Poland
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Tanzania.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2011
  • c34: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,196
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Apr 2017