Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
22 Jun 1972 | Born | ||
1 Nov 2005 | 33.3 | Entered | Member of Society of Jesus |
2007² | 34.5 | First Vows | Member of Society of Jesus |
18 Apr 2009 | 36.8 | Ordained Deacon | Deacon of Society of Jesus |
26 Jun 2010 | 38.0 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Society of Jesus |
19 Nov 2022 | 50.4 | Professed | Priest of Society of Jesus |
28 Aug 2023 | 51.1 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Anatolia, Turkey |
28 Aug 2023 | 51.1 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Tubernuca |
25 Nov 2023 | 51.4 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Tubernuca |
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Hersbruck, Archdiocese of Bamberg, Germany |
Ordained Deacon | Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy |
Ordained Priest | Gesů, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy |
Ordained Bishop | S. Antonio di Padova, Basilica, Istanbul |
Source(s):
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 25 Nov 2023 |
✠