Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Slavomir Miklovš

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1934BornDjurdjevo Backa
7 Jul 196430.1Ordained PriestPriest of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
22 Jan 198348.7AppointedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
25 Mar 198348.9Ordained BishopBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
25 May 200975.0RetiredBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
21 Jul 201177.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Slavomir Miklovš:
Bishop Slavomir Miklovš (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Križevci (Kreutz)

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 May 2009
  • d: CB, 23 Jul 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Apr 2014