Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ján Hirka

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1923BornAbramovce
31 Jul 194925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
2 Apr 196945.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
21 Dec 198966.0AppointedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
17 Feb 199066.2Ordained BishopBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
11 Dec 200279.0RetiredBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
10 Apr 201490.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ján Hirka:
Bishop Ján Hirka (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Prešov (Prjašev)

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,692
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,779
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 10 Jun 2015