Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Vasil Hopko

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Midila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1904Born
3 Feb 192924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
9 Nov 194642.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
9 Nov 194642.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Midila
11 May 194743.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Midila
23 Jul 197672.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
14 Sep 2003Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Vasil Hopko
Bishop Bl. Vasil Hopko (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHrabské

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 41
  • opd/c1: CB, 5 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast