Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Milan Chautur, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Košice (Slovakian), Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1957 Born
2 Aug 197416.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Aug 198022.9Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Jun 198123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
11 Jan 199234.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovakian), Slovakia
11 Jan 199234.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cresima
29 Feb 199234.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cresima
27 Jan 199739.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of Košice (Slovakian), Slovakia
30 Jan 200850.4AppointedBishop of Košice (Slovakian), Slovakia
18 Feb 200850.4InstalledBishop of Košice (Slovakian), Slovakia
24 Jun 202163.8ResignedBishop of Košice (Slovakian), Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Milan Chautur
Bishop Milan Chautur C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Košice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSnina
Ordained BishopNouvel arena des sports, Prešov, Eparchy of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovakian)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Košice (Slovakian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,617
  • prof/c1: CB, 5 Jun 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast