Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Rusnák

Bishop of Bratislava (Slovakian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1950 BornHumenne
16 Jun 198736.8Ordained PriestPriest of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
30 Jan 200857.4AppointedBishop of Bratislava (Slovakian), Slovakia
16 Feb 200857.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bratislava (Slovakian), Slovakia
9 Mar 200857.5InstalledBishop of Bratislava (Slovakian), Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Peter Rusnák:
Bishop Peter Rusnák (born ) Bishop of Bratislava

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Bratislava (Slovakian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,677

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013