Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Milan Lach, S.J.

Bishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1973 Born
11 Nov 200026.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
1 Jul 200127.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
19 Apr 201339.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
19 Apr 201339.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ostracine
1 Jun 201339.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ostracine
24 Jun 201743.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA
21 Jul 201743.6InstalledApostolic Administrator of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA
1 Jun 201844.5AppointedBishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA
30 Jun 201844.6InstalledBishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Milan Lach
Bishop Milan Lach S.J. (born ) Bishop of Parma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKežmarok
Ordained BishopDormition de la MŤre de Dieu, Basilica, Lutine

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Parma (Ruthenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2013
  • c01/ob: CB, 19 Apr 2013
  • c2+: CB, 20 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,798
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2018
  • i: CB, 7 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jun 2018

Quantcast