Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Augustine Di Noia, O.P.

Official of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith

Titular Archbishop of Oregon City


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1943 BornNew York, NY, USA
4 Jun 197026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Jun 200965.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Oregon City
16 Jun 200965.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
11 Jul 200966.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Oregon City
26 Jun 201269.0AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
21 Sep 201370.2AppointedOfficial of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith

MicroData Summary for Joseph Augustine Di Noia:
Archbishop Joseph Augustine Di Noia O.P. (born ) Official of Doctrine of the Faith

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,250
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013