Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Edward Charles Burke, O.P. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Chimbote

Titular Bishop of Lamiggiga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1926BornPhiladelphia, PA, USA
8 Jun 195629.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Mar 196538.3AppointedPrelate of Chimbote, Peru
8 Apr 196740.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamiggiga
25 May 196740.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamiggiga
2 Jun 197851.5ResignedPrelate of Chimbote, Peru
28 May 199467.5DiedPrelate Emeritus of Chimbote, Peru

MicroData Summary for James Edward Charles Burke:
Bishop James Edward Charles Burke O.P. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Chimbote

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013