Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Ernest Swanstrom

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Arba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1903Born
2 Jun 192825.2Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
14 Sep 196057.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
14 Sep 196057.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Arba
28 Oct 196057.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arba
4 Apr 197875.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
10 Aug 198582.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Ernest Swanstrom
Bishop Edward Ernest Swanstrom (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018