Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Timothy Cardinal Manning

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia a Piazza d’Armi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1909BornBallingeary, Ireland
16 Jun 193424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles-San Diego, California, USA
3 Aug 194636.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
3 Aug 194636.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesvi
15 Oct 194636.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lesvi
16 Oct 196757.9AppointedBishop of Fresno, California, USA
26 May 196959.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
26 May 196959.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Capreae
21 Jan 197060.2SucceededArchbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
5 Mar 197363.3Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197363.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia a Piazza d’Armi
12 Jul 198575.7RetiredArchbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
23 Jun 198979.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Timothy Manning:
Cardinal Timothy Manning (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Los Angeles

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
  • a cardinal for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1946, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013